Faris Chilmeran resumes & CV records
Resumes
Global Delivery Director - Process Control Domain It Security
Global Delivery Director - Process Control Domain It Security Cgi Mar 2014 - Jun 2014
Project Director Cgi Sep 2012 - Jan 2014
Program Manager Logica Feb 2011 - Jun 2012
Senior Project Manager Logica Aug 1, 2010 - Dec 1, 2010
Project Manager Saic Aug 1, 2001 - Aug 1, 2010
Program Manager Cgi Mar 1, 2000 - Aug 1, 2001
Regional Sales Support Manager Capgemini Jun 1, 1998 - Jan 1, 2000
Director, Solution Development Hewlett-Packard May 1, 1994 - May 1, 1998
Managing Consultant Hewlett-Packard Sep 1, 1992 - May 1, 1994
Product Manager Hewlett-Packard Sep 1, 1985 - Sep 1, 1992
System Engineer Manager Crest Engineering Sep 1, 1980 - Mar 1, 1982
Electrical Engineer
University of Baghdad 1976 - 1980
Bachelors, Bachelor of Science In Electrical Engineering, Electrical Engineering
Uae
Arabic