Jason Alles resumes & CV records
Resumes
General Manager And Partner
Location:
2773 Hawk Trace Ct northeast #northeast, Marietta, GA 30066
Industry:
Health, Wellness And Fitness
Work:
Fitness 1440 Marietta
General Manager and Partner Justfitness 4U Oct 1, 2013 - Dec 1, 2014
Vice President Infinity Digital Marketing Group Oct 1, 2013 - Dec 1, 2014
Founder and Chief Strategist Solution Marketing Dec 2012 - Oct 2013
Executive Director of Digital Marketing Send Out Cards Dec 2012 - Oct 2013
Distritbutor Golds Gym of Georgia Nov 2004 - May 2007
Director of Operations and Area Supervisor Cnf Nov 2004 - May 2007
President and Chief Executive Officer 24 Hour Fitness Sep 1, 2001 - Oct 1, 2003
Do It All Sportslife Fitness Jun 1986 - Oct 1999
General Manager
General Manager and Partner Justfitness 4U Oct 1, 2013 - Dec 1, 2014
Vice President Infinity Digital Marketing Group Oct 1, 2013 - Dec 1, 2014
Founder and Chief Strategist Solution Marketing Dec 2012 - Oct 2013
Executive Director of Digital Marketing Send Out Cards Dec 2012 - Oct 2013
Distritbutor Golds Gym of Georgia Nov 2004 - May 2007
Director of Operations and Area Supervisor Cnf Nov 2004 - May 2007
President and Chief Executive Officer 24 Hour Fitness Sep 1, 2001 - Oct 1, 2003
Do It All Sportslife Fitness Jun 1986 - Oct 1999
General Manager
Education:
Skyline College 1991 - 1991
School of Hard Knocks, the University of Life
Capuchino High School
School of Hard Knocks, the University of Life
Capuchino High School
Skills:
Fitness, Marketing, Personal Training, Customer Service, Public Speaking, Social Media, Advertising, Entrepreneurship, Team Building, Web Marketing, Social Media Marketing, Start Ups, Digital Marketing, Fitness Training, Marketing Strategy, Lead Generation, Business Development, Internet Marketing, Event Management, Online Advertising, Facebook, Leadership Development, Seo, Direct Marketing, Direct Sales, Time Management
Interests:
Workingout
Basketball
Reading
Basketball
Reading
Languages:
English
Owner, In Balance
Location:
2773 Hawk Trace Ct northeast #northeast, Marietta, GA 30066
Industry:
Professional Training & Coaching
Work:
In Balance
Owner, In Balance
Owner, In Balance
Jason Alles
Work:
Cnf
2005 - 2011
President
President
Jason Alles
Manager Left Standing, Senior Technician At Ibew Local 357
Position:
Manager at Left Standing
Location:
Las Vegas, Nevada
Industry:
Music
Work:
Left Standing
since Jun 2006
Manager Fisk Technologies - Las Vegas, Nevada Area Feb 2007 - Dec 2009
Senior Tech Effecient Electric Jan 2000 - Jan 2007
Foreman/Sales Centurion Integrated Systems - Las Vegas Jan 1998 - Jan 2000
Tech
Manager Fisk Technologies - Las Vegas, Nevada Area Feb 2007 - Dec 2009
Senior Tech Effecient Electric Jan 2000 - Jan 2007
Foreman/Sales Centurion Integrated Systems - Las Vegas Jan 1998 - Jan 2000
Tech
Education:
H.T.I. 1988 - 1989
Associates, Computer Electronics Clark High School 1986 - 1988
Associates, Computer Electronics Clark High School 1986 - 1988
Skills:
Music Industry, Artist Management, Data Center, Fiber Optics, OTDR, Fusion Splicing, Cat 6, Patch Panels, Premise Wiring, Music, Talent Management
Interests:
music, shows, networking, ATV's, fishing, camping, snowboarding, skating
Honor & Awards:
http://www.vegasrocksmag.com/wp_images/33_VRMAWinners_0910PROOF2.JPG
Jason is the best. I've worked on and off with him and Left Standing for 5+ years, and they always present as total pros. I would recommend them without any reservation for any gig, show or project.
- Mr. Steven B. Eggleston
Owner, Cnf Inc.
Position:
Owner at CNF Inc.
Location:
Greater Atlanta Area
Industry:
Health, Wellness and Fitness
Work:
CNF Inc.
Owner
Owner
Education:
Skyline 1990 - 1992
Jason Alles - Woodstock, GA
Work:
Just Fitness 4U - Atlanta, GA Oct 2013 to Jan 2015
Vice President Global Fitness Association Jan 2011 to Oct 2013
Vice President of Marketing Source 4Fitness - Woodstock, GA Jan 2007 to Jan 2011
Owner/Operator Gold's Gym - Atlanta, GA Oct 2002 to Oct 2004
Executive Director of Operations Sportslife - Atlanta, GA Jun 1985 to Apr 2000
Operations/Sales/Sales Manager/General Manager
Vice President Global Fitness Association Jan 2011 to Oct 2013
Vice President of Marketing Source 4Fitness - Woodstock, GA Jan 2007 to Jan 2011
Owner/Operator Gold's Gym - Atlanta, GA Oct 2002 to Oct 2004
Executive Director of Operations Sportslife - Atlanta, GA Jun 1985 to Apr 2000
Operations/Sales/Sales Manager/General Manager
Skills:
Social Media, Sales Management, Recruiting, Computers