Industry:
Information Technology And Services
Work:
Nurture • A Wellcare Marketplace
Founder
Nurture
Founder
Operations It and Business Executive Consultant Advisor
Jun 2016 - Aug 2018
Principal
Viawest
Dec 2014 - Jul 2016
Chief Operating Officer
Ip Commerce
May 2013 - Jun 2014
Chief Operating Officer
Ip Commerce
Dec 2011 - Apr 2013
Vp, Operations
It Leadership Management Strategy and Execution
Jan 2011 - Jun 2011
It Consultant
Barclays Investment Bank
Oct 1, 2008 - Dec 1, 2010
Director and Senior Vice President, Equities It - Global Head of Application Management
Lehman Brothers
Apr 1, 2002 - Oct 1, 2008
Senior Vice President of It
Smallworld.com
Feb 1, 2000 - Feb 1, 2001
Chief Technology Officer
Sticky Networks
1999 - 2000
Chief Technology Officer
Trecom and Dmr
1992 - 1998
Practice Director
Accenture
1989 - 1991
Consultant
Education:
Middlebury College 1984 - 1988
Bachelors, Bachelor of Arts, Philosophy, Sociology
Dalton School 1972 - 1984
Skills:
It Strategy, Program Management, Management, Software Development, Vendor Management, Enterprise Architecture, Project Management, Leadership, Consulting, Sdlc, Cloud Computing, It Management, Operations Management, Saas, Enterprise Software, Trading Systems, It Service Management, Payment Systems, Risk Management, Agile Project Management, Executive Management, Operational Excellence, Development Management, Itil Process, Solution Architecture, Erp Implementations, Pmo, Project Governance, Project Portfolio Management, It Outsourcing, Financial Systems, It Consulting, Itil Process Implementation, It Infrastructure Management, Applications Development Management, Software Deployment Automation